Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Malaspina

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹Born
17 Sep 162940.7AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
13 Dec 162940.9Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
16 Oct 165566.7DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Malaspina
Bishop Giovanni Battista Malaspina (born 1589, died ) Bishop of Massa Marittima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Luni e Sarzana
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro di Monte Cavallo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 234
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: AT, 13 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,986

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast