Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Emmanuele Cardinal Pio di Savoia

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1585BornFerrara, Italy
9 Jun 160419.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 160419.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
2 Oct 162338.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
16 Mar 162641.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
16 Sep 162641.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
14 Apr 162742.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
9 May 162742.3Ordained BishopBishop of Albano
15 Jul 163045.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
28 Mar 163954.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
1 Jun 164156.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Carlo Emmanuele Pio di Savoia:
Carlo Emmanuele Cardinal Pio di Savoia (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
  • a cardinal for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 8
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 89, Number 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015