Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Francesco Montorio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1556¹BornRoma
7 Feb 159438.0AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
24 Feb 159438.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
1620²64.0ResignedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
4 Aug 162165.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
15 Jun 162468.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
6 Jun 164387.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicastro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Francesco Montorio (VIAF: 22933890)
Bishop Pietro Francesco Montorio (born 1556, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro

  • a bishop for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,627
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 256
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 256
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016