Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Castracani (Castracane)

Deceased

Bishop of Fano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornFano
8 Oct 162949.7AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
11 Oct 162949.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
28 Oct 162949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
22 Jun 163252.4ResignedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
30 Jul 163454.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
30 Sep 163454.7AppointedApostolic Collector to Portugal
15 Nov 164060.8ResignedApostolic Collector to Portugal
22 Jun 164363.4AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
22 Jul 164969.5DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Castracani (Castracane) (VIAF: 99957711)
Bishop Alessandro Castracani (Castracane) (born 1580, died ) Bishop of Fano

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 256, and Page 185
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 91, Number 542
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 9
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016