Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Fontana

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹Born
12 Jun 164549.4AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
18 Jun 164549.4Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
16 Aug 1654³58.6DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roberto Fontana
Bishop Roberto Fontana (born 1596, died ) Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModene

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast