Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Giacomo Cardinal Panciroli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Secretary of State


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587²BornRoma, Italy
16 Dec 164154.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
12 Jan 164255.0Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
18 Jan 164255.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
13 Jul 164356.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jul 164457.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Sep 1644³57.6AppointedSecretary of State
28 Nov 164457.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
3 Sep 165164.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo Panciroli (VIAF: 209831187)
Giovanni Giacomo Cardinal Panciroli (born 1587, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
  • a cardinal for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 25, and Page 162
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 106, Number 643
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 2
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 2 Dec 2016