Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Biglia

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹BornMezzana Biglia
10 Feb 164861.1AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
24 Jan 164962.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
4 Jun 165972.4DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Biglia (VIAF: 251154213)
Bishop Francesco Biglia (born 1587, died ) Bishop of Pavia

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 273
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 39
  • ob/c2: AT, 30 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 2 Dec 2016