Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Nerli (Sr.)

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594²BornFlorence
Aug 1649³55.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 165056.1AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
7 Jun 165056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia, Italy
16 Dec 165258.9AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
29 Nov 166975.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 May 167076.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
6 Nov 167076.8DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Nerli (Sr.):
Francesco Cardinal Nerli (Sr.) (died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 21.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
  • a cardinal for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1669
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 188, and Page 281
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 25 Mar 2015