Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Corio (Coiro)

Deceased

Bishop of Parma


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1650AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
6 Jun 1650Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
26 Jul 1651DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Corio (Coiro)
Bishop Girolamo Corio (Coiro) (died ) Bishop of Parma

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 13
  • ob: CB, 18 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Dec 2016