Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Didier Dominique Marini

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1599Born
1 Mar 164949.3AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
11 Apr 164949.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
11 Jul 164949.7InstalledArchbishop of Avignon, France
20 Jun 166969.6DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Didier Dominique Marini
Archbishop Didier Dominique Marini (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018