Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giambattista Cardinal Spínola (Sr.)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Genova

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1615³BornMadrid, Spain
18 May 164832.6AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
14 Jun 164832.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
10 Nov 166449.1AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
16 Mar 168165.4ResignedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
1 Sep 168165.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 168166.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
20 Feb 169680.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
7 Apr 169882.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
4 Jan 170488.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Spínola (Sr.):
Giambattista Cardinal Spínola (Sr.) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Genova

  • a bishop for 55.5 years
  • a cardinal for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 67
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015