Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Barbosa

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1590BornGuimaraes, Portugal
4 Jul 164857.8SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
22 Mar 164958.5ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
5 Apr 164958.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
19 Nov 164959.2DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Barbosa:
Bishop Agostino Barbosa (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 351
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 112, Number 684
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013