Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspar Cardinal de Borja y Velasco

Deceased

Bishop of Albano

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Archbishop of Toledo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1580BornVillalpando
17 Aug 161131.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 161131.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
17 Oct 161636.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
15 Jul 163050.0AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
15 Jul 163050.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
15 Sep 163050.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albano, Italy
19 Jan 163251.5AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
16 Jan 164564.5AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
28 Dec 164565.5DiedBishop of Albano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaspar de Borja y Velasco:
Gaspar Cardinal de Borja y Velasco (born , died ) Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
  • a cardinal for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 152, Number 968
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015