Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Durán

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1634AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
23 Apr 1634Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
12 Feb 1651³DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Durán:
Bishop Pablo Durán (died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 354
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 160, Number 1,009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014