Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Escartín Arbeza, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹BornZaragoza
3 Dec 164657.9SelectedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
27 May 164758.4ConfirmedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
6 Oct 164758.8Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
31 Jan 165667.1AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
6 Apr 166475.3SelectedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
21 Jul 166475.6ConfirmedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
24 Apr 167384.3DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Escartín Arbeza:
Bishop Miguel Escartín Arbeza O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,739
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 110, and Page 208
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 338
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 177, Number 1,099

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014