Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Cebrián Pedro, O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1585BornPerales de Alfambra
1613¹27.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
5 Sep 163347.9AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
9 Jul 163549.7AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
18 Apr 164458.5AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
27 Dec 166277.2DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Cebrián Pedro:
Archbishop Juan Cebrián Pedro O. de M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 50.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 74, and Page 126
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 331
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 159, Number 1,003

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014