Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Antonio Francés de Urrutigoyti y Lerma

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603¹BornZaragoza
14 Feb 165653.1AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
25 Jun 165653.4Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
30 Oct 167269.8SelectedBishop of Teruel, Spain
30 Jan 167370.0ConfirmedBishop of Teruel, Spain
24 Jul 167370.5SelectedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
25 Sep 167370.7ConfirmedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
7 Apr 168279.2DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Antonio Francés de Urrutigoyti y Lerma:
Bishop Diego Antonio Francés de Urrutigoyti y Lerma (born 1603, died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,868
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 186, Number 1,160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 372, and Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015