Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Mateo Sánchez de Castellar

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626¹Born
21 Aug 167650.6SelectedBishop of Jaca, Spain
8 Feb 167751.1ConfirmedBishop of Jaca, Spain
18 Jul 167751.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
28 Sep 168256.7SelectedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
11 Jan 168357.0AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
13 Nov 170074.8DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Mateo Sánchez de Castellar
Bishop Bernardo Mateo Sánchez de Castellar (born 1626, died ) Bishop of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOjos Negros
Ordained BishopZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 223, and Page 381
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 216, Number 1,342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,213
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast