Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón de Azlor y Berbegal

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622BornOscen
12 Jul 167755.5AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
7 Nov 167755.8Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
7 Sep 168563.7DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón de Azlor y Berbegal:
Bishop Ramón de Azlor y Berbegal (died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 298
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013