Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando de Sada Azcona

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jul 1654AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
7 Mar 1655Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
5 Mar 1670DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Sada Azcona:
Bishop Fernando de Sada Azcona (died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 14.9 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,867
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 184, Number 1,152
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 266
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015