Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Gil y Miravete de Blancas

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1634AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
6 May 1635Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
25 Aug 1638DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Gil y Miravete de Blancas:
Bishop Gaspar Gil y Miravete de Blancas (died ) Bishop of Vic

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,053

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013