Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo de Ipenza

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornTarazona
4 Sep 164868.6SelectedBishop of Jaca, Spain
7 Dec 164868.9ConfirmedBishop of Jaca, Spain
30 Nov 164969.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
12 Jul 165272.5DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo de Ipenza:
Bishop Jerónimo de Ipenza (died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,507
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,865
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 179, Number 1,113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015