Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé de Foncalda (Fontcalda), O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597²BornZaragoza
3 Feb 165356.0AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
15 Jun 165356.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
17 Nov 167174.8AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
27 Feb 167477.1DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé de Foncalda (Fontcalda):
Bishop Bartolomé de Foncalda (Fontcalda) O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,740
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 182, Number 1,137
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205
  • bd: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015