Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco López de Urraca, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹BornLa Almunia de Doña Godina
15 Jan 167261.0AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
24 Apr 167261.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
13 Sep 167766.6AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
14 Apr 168170.2AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
27 Jan 169584.0DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco López de Urraca:
Bishop Francisco López de Urraca O.S.A. (born 1611, died ) Bishop of Barbastro

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 78, and Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 124
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,741
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 208, Number 1,302
  • ob: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015