Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín de Funes Lafiguera

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588²BornBubierca
6 Feb 164557.0AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
2 Jun 164557.4Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
31 Dec 165365.9DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín de Funes Lafiguera:
Bishop Martín de Funes Lafiguera (born 1588, died ) Bishop of Albarracin

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 75
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,738
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 174, Number 1,084
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015