Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal de la Cueva-Benavides y Mendoza-Carrillo

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572²BornBeznar, Spain
5 Sep 162250.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Jul 163361.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
9 Jul 163563.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Balbina
17 Oct 164472.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
23 Oct 164472.8Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
27 Jul 164876.6AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
10 Aug 165583.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de la Cueva-Benavides y Mendoza-Carrillo:
Cardinal Alfonso de la Cueva-Benavides y Mendoza-Carrillo (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
  • a cardinal for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Sep 1622
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013