Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Antonio Agudio

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1650Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Nov 1650Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 1650AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
30 Nov 1650Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
15 Jan 1673DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Antonio Agudio
Bishop Carlo Antonio Agudio (died ) Bishop of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilan

  • a priest for 22.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 139
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 113, Number 690
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1650, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018