Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Caracciolo, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹Born
10 Nov 163132.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrene
14 Dec 163132.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cyrene
20 Sep 163637.7SelectedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
30 Mar 163738.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
1663¹64.0DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Caracciolo (VIAF: 304917646)
Archbishop Tommaso Caracciolo C.R. (born 1599, died 1663) Archbishop of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvellino
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea della Monache, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceTaranto, Archdiocese of Taranto

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 327, and Page 172
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 17
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,897

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2019

Quantcast