Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Palumbo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornNapoli
18 May 161542.4AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
17 Apr 161744.3AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
5 May 164875.3DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Palumbo:
Bishop Paolo Palumbo C.R. (died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 366, and Page 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013