Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Pineri, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Oct 1649AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
7 Nov 1649Ordained BishopBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
14 Mar 1672ResignedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Pineri
Bishop Vincenzo Pineri O.F.M. Conv. , Bishop Emeritus of Polignano (Polinianum)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,837
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 284
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018