Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Ridolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1587Born
3 Mar 164961.4SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
19 Jul 164961.8ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
12 Sep 164962.0Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
28 Oct 164962.1DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Louis Ridolfi
Bishop Louis Ridolfi (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast