Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Lupi

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598¹BornBergomo
21 Aug 164547.6AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
8 Oct 164547.7Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
4 Jan 166870.0DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lupi:
Bishop Antonio Lupi (died ) Bishop of Treviso

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015