Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rinaldo Cardinal d’Este

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618BornModena, Italy
16 Dec 164124.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 164426.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
12 Dec 164426.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
5 Dec 165032.9AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
19 Nov 165133.9Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
23 Apr 166042.3ResignedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
12 Mar 166850.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
18 Mar 167153.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
24 Aug 167153.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
30 Sep 167254.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Rinaldo d’Este:
Cardinal Rinaldo d’Este (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 294
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013