Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurizio Solaro (di Moretta)

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607¹Born
16 Jun 164235.5AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
22 Jun 164235.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
25 Dec 165549.0DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Solaro (di Moretta):
Bishop Maurizio Solaro (di Moretta) (died ) Bishop of Mondovi

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 249
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 107, Number 650

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013