Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Mascambruno

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornBenevento
29 Jun 164245.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 164245.6AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
24 Aug 164245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
May 164346.3DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Mascambruno:
Bishop Gerolamo Mascambruno (born 1597, died May 1643) Bishop of Isernia

  • a priest for .8 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 211
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 107, Number 653
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015