Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo (Gaspare) Cardinal Maculani, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1578BornFiorenzola d’Arda
1594²15.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Dec 164163.2Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jan 164263.3AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
19 Jan 164263.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
10 Feb 164263.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
18 May 164364.6ResignedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
16 Feb 166788.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo (Gaspare) Maculani:
Vincenzo (Gaspare) Cardinal Maculani O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
  • a cardinal for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 25, and Page 113
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 106, Number 644
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015