Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sabin (Savino) Cvjetković (Florian), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹Born
16 Sep 164760.7AppointedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
22 Sep 164760.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
Dec 1661³74.9DiedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sabin (Savino) Cvjetković (Florian)
Bishop Sabin (Savino) Cvjetković (Florian) O.F.M. Obs. (born 1587, died Dec 1661) Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDubrovnik, Archdiocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Aracoeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceDubrovnik, Archdiocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 230
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 24
  • b/c2: AT, 10 Feb 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017