Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovan Battista Foppa, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603¹Born
14 Sep 162219.7ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
18 May 164340.3AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
25 May 164340.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
16 Dec 167370.9DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovan Battista Foppa (VIAF: 88955975)
Archbishop Giovan Battista Foppa C.O. (born 1603, died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 118
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,643, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast