Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabrizio Campana, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603¹BornLucera
22 May 165148.3AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
28 May 165148.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza, Italy
17 Sep 166764.7DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Campana
Archbishop Fabrizio Campana O.S.B. (born 1603, died ) Archbishop of Conza

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 160
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 32
  • ob/c2+: AT, 8 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Dec 2016