Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Mausoni

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Nov 1659AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
23 Nov 1659Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
4 Sep 1665DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Mausoni
Bishop Angelo Mausoni (died ) Bishop of Teramo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceL’Aquila, Diocese of L’Aquila
Ordained BishopSan Sisto delle Monache, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 88
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 46
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jan 2017