Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António da Ressurreição, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹BornLisboa
4 Dec 163460.9AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
10 Jun 163561.4Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
8 Apr 163763.2DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António da Ressurreição:
Bishop António da Ressurreição O.P. (died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1635, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015