Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Cesi (Cesa)

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566BornRome
5 Jun 159630.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159630.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
10 Mar 160842.2AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
13 Apr 160842.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza, Italy
5 Dec 161145.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
7 Jan 161347.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
161448.0ResignedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
31 Aug 162054.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
29 Mar 162155.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
5 May 162155.3AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
18 Oct 162155.8DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Cesi (Cesa):
Bartolomeo Cardinal Cesi (Cesa) (died ) Bishop of Tivoli

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
  • a cardinal for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 337, and Page 160
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014