Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bonifazio Cardinal Caetani

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567BornRome
8 Nov 159326.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 159932.9AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
11 Sep 160639.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 160740.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
22 Apr 161346.3AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
24 Jun 161750.5DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonifazio Caetani:
Cardinal Bonifazio Caetani (died ) Archbishop of Taranto

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1606
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 327, and Page 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013