Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ottavio Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona (Sr.)

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560²Born
6 Mar 159131.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Apr 159131.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
15 Mar 159333.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
22 Apr 160242.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
5 Jun 160545.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
31 Aug 160545.6AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
18 Sep 160545.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
5 Dec 161252.9DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Acquaviva d’Aragona (Sr.) (VIAF: 83611030)
Ottavio Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona (Sr.) (born 1560, died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopGesů, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
  • a cardinal for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1591
  • ob/c23: CB, 1 May 2013
  • b/c24: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 21
  • c4: AT, 6 Aug 2020
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast