Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Agostino Gradenigo

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹Born
29 Mar 161041.2AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
12 Apr 161041.2Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
20 Mar 162758.2AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy
26 Jan 162859.0SucceededPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
25 Sep 162960.7DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Gradenigo
Patriarch Agostino Gradenigo (born 1569, died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185, and Page 90
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018