Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pier Paolo Cardinal Crescenzi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572²BornRome
17 Aug 161139.6Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 161139.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
4 Jul 161240.5AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
15 Jul 161240.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
17 Mar 162149.2AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
8 Oct 162957.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1 Jul 164169.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 May 164472.3ResignedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
19 Feb 164573.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pier Paolo Crescenzi:
Pier Paolo Cardinal Crescenzi (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a bishop for 32.5 years
  • a cardinal for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 293
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 52, Number 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015