Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Malatesta Baglioni

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1581Born
Jan 1612³31.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 161231.5AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
25 Jul 161231.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
8 Jul 163453.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
8 Aug 163958.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
16 Sep 164160.7AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
11 Feb 164867.1DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Malatesta Baglioni (VIAF: 39331387)
Archbishop Malatesta Baglioni (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSant’Ambrogio della Massima, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceAssisi, Diocese of Assisi

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 97, and Page 281
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 52, Number 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 15
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 252, and Page 253
  • b/d/op/loc: AT, 14 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Dec 2018

Quantcast