Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anselm Casimir Wambold von Umstadt

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1582Born
22 May 160522.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
6 Aug 162946.6SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
28 Jan 163047.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
14 Dec 163654.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
9 Oct 164764.8DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anselm Casimir Wambold von Umstadt (VIAF: 42569428)
Archbishop Anselm Casimir Wambold von Umstadt (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz
Ordained BishopRegensburg, Diocese of Regensburg
Death PlaceFrankfurt

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 29
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,560
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 5,054

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 3 Apr 2018