Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Brandolini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Minori, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Dec 1615AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
8 Dec 1615Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
29 Feb 1636DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Brandolini
Bishop Tommaso Brandolini O.P. (died ) Bishop of Minori

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria della Pace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMinori, Diocese of Minori
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Minori, Diocese of Minori

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 244
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 39
  • ob/c2: AT, 13 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017