Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Boccapaduli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of CittÓ di Castello

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1600BornRoma
1623¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 163838.4AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
21 Sep 163838.4Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
6 May 164747.0AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
14 Sep 164747.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
24 Aug 165252.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Sep 1652³52.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
1654²53.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1 Oct 167272.4ResignedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
15 Jul 167575.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
23 Nov 168080.6DiedBishop Emeritus of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Boccapaduli (VIAF: 315964529)
Archbishop Francesco Boccapaduli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of CittÓ di Castello

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe der Deutschsprachigen Lńnder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 358, and Page 152
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 102, Number 616
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1638, Number 23
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 255
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016